|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 419, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 3615.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3614.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2821.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 10. Page 1482.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1406.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|