California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB969 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2023

Amended

Bill August 17, 2023
Bill June 29, 2023
Bill June 13, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023