Assembly | 02/01/2024 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member McCarty. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | Read first time. To print. |