California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB994 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2023

Amended

Bill August 16, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023