Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1742.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|