Assembly | 06/27/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and ELECTIONS. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 8. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2023 | Read first time. To print. |