Assembly | 06/06/2024 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5775.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2024 | Read first time. To print. |