LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA2
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA2
Action History
Assembly
03/19/2024
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
03/07/2024
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
Assembly
03/06/2024
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
04/20/2023
Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and NAT. RES.
Assembly
12/06/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
Assembly
12/05/2022
Read first time. To print.