|
07/20/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2023
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2025.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD., E. & C.A. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2023
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2023
|
Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2375.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|