08/30/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2023. | |||
08/30/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/24/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2183.) | ||
Senate | 08/22/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2570.) | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | Introduced. To print. |