09/14/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2023. | |||
09/14/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.) | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2789.) | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) . | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2023 | Introduced. To print. |