09/14/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2023. | |||
09/14/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.) | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2741.) | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/12/2023 | Introduced. To print. |