1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 118 CHAPTER 67 Relative to Vietnam Human Rights Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 30, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 118, Ta. Vietnam Human Rights Day.This measure would designate May 11, 2024, as Vietnam Human Rights Day in support of efforts to achieve freedom and human rights for the people of Vietnam. The measure would encourage Californians to commemorate the day with appropriate activities, including, but not limited to, rallies, ceremonies, and discussions.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, May 11, 2024, is the 34th anniversary of the issuance of the Manifesto of the Non-Violent Movement for Human Rights in Vietnam; andWHEREAS, The Manifesto, which calls upon Hanoi to respect basic human rights, accept a multiparty system, and restore the right of the Vietnamese people to choose their own form of government through free and fair elections, reflects the will and aspirations of the people of Vietnam; andWHEREAS, The Government of Vietnam has imposed restrictions on freedom of association, freedom of assembly, freedom of the press, and freedom of speech; andWHEREAS, Vietnam Human Rights Day has been observed in the United States annually on May 11 since its initial designation by Joint Resolution No.168 passed by the United States Congress in 1994; andWHEREAS, Vietnam Human Rights Day focuses on highlighting human rights violations, promoting human rights issues in the Socialist Republic of Vietnam, and recognizing the efforts of Vietnamese dissidents; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Census for 2020, more than 675,235 Vietnamese people live in California, with the largest concentration of Vietnamese residents found outside of Vietnam residing in the County of Orange; andWHEREAS, Many Vietnamese people residing in California fled from government oppression; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates May 11, 2024, as Vietnam Human Rights Day in support of efforts to achieve freedom and human rights for the people of Vietnam; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians to commemorate the day with appropriate activities, including, but not limited to, rallies, ceremonies, and discussions; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 28, 2024 Passed IN Senate May 23, 2024 Passed IN Assembly April 25, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 118Introduced by Assembly Member Ta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)January 03, 2024 Relative to Vietnam Human Rights Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 118, Ta. Vietnam Human Rights Day.This measure would designate May 11, 2024, as Vietnam Human Rights Day in support of efforts to achieve freedom and human rights for the people of Vietnam. The measure would encourage Californians to commemorate the day with appropriate activities, including, but not limited to, rallies, ceremonies, and discussions.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, May 11, 2024, is the 34th anniversary of the issuance of the Manifesto of the Non-Violent Movement for Human Rights in Vietnam; andWHEREAS, The Manifesto, which calls upon Hanoi to respect basic human rights, accept a multiparty system, and restore the right of the Vietnamese people to choose their own form of government through free and fair elections, reflects the will and aspirations of the people of Vietnam; andWHEREAS, The Government of Vietnam has imposed restrictions on freedom of association, freedom of assembly, freedom of the press, and freedom of speech; andWHEREAS, Vietnam Human Rights Day has been observed in the United States annually on May 11 since its initial designation by Joint Resolution No.168 passed by the United States Congress in 1994; andWHEREAS, Vietnam Human Rights Day focuses on highlighting human rights violations, promoting human rights issues in the Socialist Republic of Vietnam, and recognizing the efforts of Vietnamese dissidents; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Census for 2020, more than 675,235 Vietnamese people live in California, with the largest concentration of Vietnamese residents found outside of Vietnam residing in the County of Orange; andWHEREAS, Many Vietnamese people residing in California fled from government oppression; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates May 11, 2024, as Vietnam Human Rights Day in support of efforts to achieve freedom and human rights for the people of Vietnam; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians to commemorate the day with appropriate activities, including, but not limited to, rallies, ceremonies, and discussions; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|