03/04/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 17, Statutes of 2024. | |||
03/04/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3210.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3887.) | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 16). | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2024 | Introduced. To print. |