06/20/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 106, Statutes of 2024. | |||
06/20/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/13/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4492.) | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2024 | Introduced. To print. |