|
07/18/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2024
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6149.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4848.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5616.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2024
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2024
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|