1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131 CHAPTER 20 Relative to National School Counseling Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 04, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 131, Muratsuchi. National School Counseling Week.This measure would recognize February 5, 2024, to February 9, 2024, as National School Counseling Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California school counselors are employed in public and private schools to help pupils reach their full potential; and WHEREAS, All children and youth can learn with the appropriate supports, and have the absolute right to an education that meets their needs; and WHEREAS, Childrens mental health and resilience are interconnected with their learning and postsecondary success; and WHEREAS, School counselors provide services and coordinate programs to improve school climate and increase pupils feelings of connectedness within the school setting; and WHEREAS, School counselors deliver a range of services to reduce mental health stigma, identify risk factors and warning signs of pupils at risk for mental health and behavioral disorders, and provide counseling services to strengthen pupils prospects for school and life success; and WHEREAS, School counselors address trauma caused by racial injustice and are positioned in school settings to promote equity, healing, and support for all pupils; and WHEREAS, School counselors provide high-quality career education programs from kindergarten through grade 12 that promote the link between learning and future career choices, including career technical education; and WHEREAS, School counselors counsel secondary pupils to satisfy the AG curricular requirements for college admissions and encourage participation in college preparation programs, including, but not limited to, Advancement Via Individual Determination (AVID), Early College, Advanced Placement, and International Baccalaureate programs, by increasing pupils awareness of potential careers associated with interests and talents so they may become productive members of society; and WHEREAS, California school counselors support and consult with parents, teachers, and other educators to help youth explore their potential and set realistic goals for themselves; and WHEREAS, The citizens of California should recognize the vital role that the over 12,000 school counselors play in the social, emotional, career, and academic development of our children; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes February 5, 2024, to February 9, 2024, as National School Counseling Week; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled February 28, 2024 Passed IN Senate February 26, 2024 Passed IN Assembly February 01, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131Introduced by Assembly Member Muratsuchi(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, McKinnor, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Pellerin, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)January 22, 2024 Relative to National School Counseling Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 131, Muratsuchi. National School Counseling Week.This measure would recognize February 5, 2024, to February 9, 2024, as National School Counseling Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California school counselors are employed in public and private schools to help pupils reach their full potential; and WHEREAS, All children and youth can learn with the appropriate supports, and have the absolute right to an education that meets their needs; and WHEREAS, Childrens mental health and resilience are interconnected with their learning and postsecondary success; and WHEREAS, School counselors provide services and coordinate programs to improve school climate and increase pupils feelings of connectedness within the school setting; and WHEREAS, School counselors deliver a range of services to reduce mental health stigma, identify risk factors and warning signs of pupils at risk for mental health and behavioral disorders, and provide counseling services to strengthen pupils prospects for school and life success; and WHEREAS, School counselors address trauma caused by racial injustice and are positioned in school settings to promote equity, healing, and support for all pupils; and WHEREAS, School counselors provide high-quality career education programs from kindergarten through grade 12 that promote the link between learning and future career choices, including career technical education; and WHEREAS, School counselors counsel secondary pupils to satisfy the AG curricular requirements for college admissions and encourage participation in college preparation programs, including, but not limited to, Advancement Via Individual Determination (AVID), Early College, Advanced Placement, and International Baccalaureate programs, by increasing pupils awareness of potential careers associated with interests and talents so they may become productive members of society; and WHEREAS, California school counselors support and consult with parents, teachers, and other educators to help youth explore their potential and set realistic goals for themselves; and WHEREAS, The citizens of California should recognize the vital role that the over 12,000 school counselors play in the social, emotional, career, and academic development of our children; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes February 5, 2024, to February 9, 2024, as National School Counseling Week; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|