Senate | 08/30/2024 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Becker. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4149.) | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 29). | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | Introduced. To print. |