Senate | 03/06/2024 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 4188.) | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2024 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2024 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 20). | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | Introduced. To print. |