08/13/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/13/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6196.). | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2024 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4675.) | ||
Senate | 06/19/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 5775.) | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 3). | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | Introduced. To print. |