04/02/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2024. | |||
04/02/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3390.) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4260.) | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 26). | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | Introduced. To print. |