07/02/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2024. | |||
07/02/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4628.) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5033.) | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Introduced. To print. |