04/19/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2024. | |||
04/19/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3673.) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4475.) | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Introduced. To print. |