05/08/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2024. | |||
05/08/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3832.) | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4659.) | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 21). | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2024 | Introduced. To print. |