1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 160 CHAPTER 55 Relative to Women in STEM Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 19, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 160, Weber. Women in STEM Day.This measure would proclaim March 23, 2024, as California Women in STEM Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California as a state is committed towards promoting diversity and gender equality by ensuring that all genders have equal opportunity in science, technology, engineering, and math (STEM); andWHEREAS, Throughout history, women have made extensive contributions in the areas of STEM; andWHEREAS, Data indicates that gender image, as it relates to STEM subjects in school, may impact a young womans aspirations to pursue studies in STEM-related majors at the college level; andWHEREAS, Women are underrepresented in STEM-related fields, comprising approximately 28 percent of workers in STEM-related jobs, despite advancements in technology which have resulted in an increased number of STEM jobs overall; andWHEREAS, Female scientists and engineers have occupations concentrated in the fields of social sciences (60 percent) and biological, agricultural, and environmental life sciences (48 percent) with relatively low participation in engineering (15 percent) and computer and mathematical sciences (26 percent) as compared to men; andWHEREAS, The percentage of women occupying computer and mathematical occupations has decreased compared to the past (26.9 percent); andWHEREAS, Women have made enormous strides in making up biological (55 percent), chemical and material (36 percent), and engineering (16.6 percent) occupations compared to the past; andWHEREAS, Without women, many of the advancements in STEM would not be seen in todays society; andWHEREAS, California encourages the participation of women to join STEM careers to level the gender imbalances within those careers; andWHEREAS, California celebrates, supports, and commends those who have aided in furthering the participation and involvement of women in STEM careers and activities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims March 23, 2024, as California Women in STEM Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled April 18, 2024 Passed IN Senate April 18, 2024 Passed IN Assembly March 21, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 160Introduced by Assembly Member Weber(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Alanis, Alvarez, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Holden, Hoover, Jackson, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Reyes, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Santiago, Schiavo, Ting, Valencia, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Wicks, Wilson, and Wood)March 11, 2024 Relative to Women in STEM Day.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 160, Weber. Women in STEM Day.This measure would proclaim March 23, 2024, as California Women in STEM Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California as a state is committed towards promoting diversity and gender equality by ensuring that all genders have equal opportunity in science, technology, engineering, and math (STEM); andWHEREAS, Throughout history, women have made extensive contributions in the areas of STEM; andWHEREAS, Data indicates that gender image, as it relates to STEM subjects in school, may impact a young womans aspirations to pursue studies in STEM-related majors at the college level; andWHEREAS, Women are underrepresented in STEM-related fields, comprising approximately 28 percent of workers in STEM-related jobs, despite advancements in technology which have resulted in an increased number of STEM jobs overall; andWHEREAS, Female scientists and engineers have occupations concentrated in the fields of social sciences (60 percent) and biological, agricultural, and environmental life sciences (48 percent) with relatively low participation in engineering (15 percent) and computer and mathematical sciences (26 percent) as compared to men; andWHEREAS, The percentage of women occupying computer and mathematical occupations has decreased compared to the past (26.9 percent); andWHEREAS, Women have made enormous strides in making up biological (55 percent), chemical and material (36 percent), and engineering (16.6 percent) occupations compared to the past; andWHEREAS, Without women, many of the advancements in STEM would not be seen in todays society; andWHEREAS, California encourages the participation of women to join STEM careers to level the gender imbalances within those careers; andWHEREAS, California celebrates, supports, and commends those who have aided in furthering the participation and involvement of women in STEM careers and activities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims March 23, 2024, as California Women in STEM Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|