06/05/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2024. | |||
06/05/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4267.) | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5150.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2024 | Introduced. To print. |