Senate | 08/31/2024 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5155.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | Introduced. To print. |