07/18/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2024. | |||
07/18/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 07/01/2024 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6109.). | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4630.) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5734.) | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | Introduced. To print. |