05/30/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2024. | |||
05/30/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 05/24/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4185.) | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5109.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | Introduced. To print. |