06/14/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2024. | |||
06/14/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4356.) | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Introduced. To print. |