07/02/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2024. | |||
07/02/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/27/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5110.) | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Introduced. To print. |