09/14/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2023. | |||
09/14/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/05/2023 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2925.). | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2023 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2239.) | ||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2023 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Laird. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1599.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | Introduced. To print. |