1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 183 CHAPTER 92 Relative to IgA Nephropathy Awareness Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 05, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 183, Bennett. IgA Nephropathy Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim May 14, 2024, as IgA Nephropathy Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, IgA Nephropathy, also known as IgAN or Bergers disease, is a rare kidney disorder characterized by the buildup of immunoglobulin A (IgA), a protein that helps breakdown the normal filtering mechanisms in the kidneys; andWHEREAS, IgAN is one of the most common and undetected kidney diseases and is estimated to affect approximately 150,000 people in the United States; andWHEREAS, There is no current cure for IgAN, and treatments can only focus on slowing the progress of the disease and preventing complications; andWHEREAS, Approximately 20 to 40 percent of individuals who have IgAN will develop end-stage kidney disease and need dialysis or kidney transplantation to survive; andWHEREAS, Today, there is hope on the horizon for IgAN patients with over 30 clinical trials underway and newly approved treatments for rare kidney diseases, including IgAN; andWHEREAS, We need to raise awareness of IgA Nephropathy, provide support to patients, and promote the research needed to lead to better diagnosis and an eventual cure; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims May 14, 2024, as IgA Nephropathy Awareness Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 31, 2024 Passed IN Senate May 30, 2024 Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 183Introduced by Assembly Member Bennett(Principal coauthor: Senator Limn)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Garcia, Gipson, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Ortega, Pacheco, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)April 23, 2024 Relative to IgA Nephropathy Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 183, Bennett. IgA Nephropathy Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim May 14, 2024, as IgA Nephropathy Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, IgA Nephropathy, also known as IgAN or Bergers disease, is a rare kidney disorder characterized by the buildup of immunoglobulin A (IgA), a protein that helps breakdown the normal filtering mechanisms in the kidneys; andWHEREAS, IgAN is one of the most common and undetected kidney diseases and is estimated to affect approximately 150,000 people in the United States; andWHEREAS, There is no current cure for IgAN, and treatments can only focus on slowing the progress of the disease and preventing complications; andWHEREAS, Approximately 20 to 40 percent of individuals who have IgAN will develop end-stage kidney disease and need dialysis or kidney transplantation to survive; andWHEREAS, Today, there is hope on the horizon for IgAN patients with over 30 clinical trials underway and newly approved treatments for rare kidney diseases, including IgAN; andWHEREAS, We need to raise awareness of IgA Nephropathy, provide support to patients, and promote the research needed to lead to better diagnosis and an eventual cure; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims May 14, 2024, as IgA Nephropathy Awareness Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|