1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 187 CHAPTER 109 Relative to Schizophrenia Awareness Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 20, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 187, Chen. Schizophrenia Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim May 24, 2024, as Schizophrenia Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Schizophrenia is a serious mental health condition and one of the top 15 leading causes of disability worldwide; andWHEREAS, Schizophrenia is characterized by persistent psychotic symptoms such as auditory hallucinations, visual hallucinations, delusional thinking, dissociation from reality, and disorganized thoughts and behavior; andWHEREAS, Schizophrenia symptoms typically emerge in adolescence or early adulthood and can be persistent and disabling when left untreated, interfering with a persons ability to engage in typical school, work, and social activities; andWHEREAS, Schizophrenia affects about 24,000,000 people in the world and about 330,000 people in California, the highest number of affected individuals of any state in the country; andWHEREAS, The life expectancy of people living with schizophrenia is reduced by 10 to 20 years compared with the general population, often due to multiple chronic health conditions, as well as the fact that approximately 5 percent of people living with schizophrenia die by suicide, a rate that is far greater than that of the general population; and WHEREAS, The standard of care for mental health condition treatment has been largely unchanged for over 60 years and many individuals continue to suffer from unmet needs as a result of a significant lack of treatment innovation for severe and disabling mental health conditions. The development of first-episode psychosis treatment protocols is one promising exception; andWHEREAS, Because of the limited advancements in serious mental health condition treatments, people living with serious and disabling mental health conditions such as schizophrenia need access to new and vital medications, therapeutic treatments, and recovery support services that could enable individuals to live better, more fulfilled lives; andWHEREAS, The Legislature believes in the importance of increasing awareness of mental health conditions that, absent early and effective intervention, are often severely debilitating, impacting the person, their families, and their loved ones; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims May 24, 2024, as Schizophrenia Awareness Day in the State of California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 18, 2024 Passed IN Senate June 13, 2024 Passed IN Assembly May 24, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 187Introduced by Assembly Member Chen(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Connolly, Davies, Dixon, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Ramos, Reyes, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wilson, and Zbur)April 30, 2024 Relative to Schizophrenia Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 187, Chen. Schizophrenia Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim May 24, 2024, as Schizophrenia Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Schizophrenia is a serious mental health condition and one of the top 15 leading causes of disability worldwide; andWHEREAS, Schizophrenia is characterized by persistent psychotic symptoms such as auditory hallucinations, visual hallucinations, delusional thinking, dissociation from reality, and disorganized thoughts and behavior; andWHEREAS, Schizophrenia symptoms typically emerge in adolescence or early adulthood and can be persistent and disabling when left untreated, interfering with a persons ability to engage in typical school, work, and social activities; andWHEREAS, Schizophrenia affects about 24,000,000 people in the world and about 330,000 people in California, the highest number of affected individuals of any state in the country; andWHEREAS, The life expectancy of people living with schizophrenia is reduced by 10 to 20 years compared with the general population, often due to multiple chronic health conditions, as well as the fact that approximately 5 percent of people living with schizophrenia die by suicide, a rate that is far greater than that of the general population; and WHEREAS, The standard of care for mental health condition treatment has been largely unchanged for over 60 years and many individuals continue to suffer from unmet needs as a result of a significant lack of treatment innovation for severe and disabling mental health conditions. The development of first-episode psychosis treatment protocols is one promising exception; andWHEREAS, Because of the limited advancements in serious mental health condition treatments, people living with serious and disabling mental health conditions such as schizophrenia need access to new and vital medications, therapeutic treatments, and recovery support services that could enable individuals to live better, more fulfilled lives; andWHEREAS, The Legislature believes in the importance of increasing awareness of mental health conditions that, absent early and effective intervention, are often severely debilitating, impacting the person, their families, and their loved ones; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims May 24, 2024, as Schizophrenia Awareness Day in the State of California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|