1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 189 CHAPTER 95 Relative to food allergy awareness. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 05, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 189, Wallis. Food allergy awareness.This measure would encourage all Californians to make themselves and their families aware of the risk of food allergies and preventative measures, and to educate themselves regarding emergency responses. The measure would declare May as Food Allergy Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, As many as 33 million people in the United States have a food allergy; andWHEREAS, Research indicates that the prevalence of food allergies is increasing among children, and finds that 5.6 million children under 18 years of age, roughly two in every classroom, have a food allergy; andWHEREAS, The nine foods that cause 90 percent of all food allergy reactions in the United States are shellfish, fish, milk, eggs, tree nuts, peanuts, soy, wheat, and sesame; andWHEREAS, A food allergy occurs when the immune system mistakenly targets a harmless food protein, an allergen, as a threat and attacks it, releasing abnormally large amounts of antibodies that fight the food allergens, which in turn trigger the symptoms of an allergic reaction; andWHEREAS, Symptoms of a food allergy can include a tingling sensation in the mouth, swelling of the tongue and throat, difficulty breathing, hives, vomiting, a drop in blood pressure, loss of consciousness, or death; andWHEREAS, Consumption of a food allergen may lead to anaphylaxis, a potentially fatal condition in which several different parts of the body experience the allergic reaction and can, within minutes of exposure, lead to difficulty breathing and unconsciousness; and WHEREAS, Zacky Muoz, a California student and food allergy champion 12 years of age, continues to lead the charge in helping to improve the landscape in California schools for children with food allergies; andWHEREAS, There is no cure for a food allergy, only epinephrine intervention, and the only sure way to avoid a reaction is to exercise strict avoidance of an allergen; andWHEREAS, Education, resources, and investing in research that advances treatment and understanding of food allergies are the key to keeping individuals with food allergies safe; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That all Californians be encouraged to make themselves and their families aware of the risk of food allergies and preventative measures, and to educate themselves regarding emergency responses; and be it furtherResolved, That May is Food Allergy Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 31, 2024 Passed IN Senate May 30, 2024 Passed IN Assembly May 13, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 189Introduced by Assembly Member Wallis(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)April 30, 2024 Relative to food allergy awareness. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 189, Wallis. Food allergy awareness.This measure would encourage all Californians to make themselves and their families aware of the risk of food allergies and preventative measures, and to educate themselves regarding emergency responses. The measure would declare May as Food Allergy Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, As many as 33 million people in the United States have a food allergy; andWHEREAS, Research indicates that the prevalence of food allergies is increasing among children, and finds that 5.6 million children under 18 years of age, roughly two in every classroom, have a food allergy; andWHEREAS, The nine foods that cause 90 percent of all food allergy reactions in the United States are shellfish, fish, milk, eggs, tree nuts, peanuts, soy, wheat, and sesame; andWHEREAS, A food allergy occurs when the immune system mistakenly targets a harmless food protein, an allergen, as a threat and attacks it, releasing abnormally large amounts of antibodies that fight the food allergens, which in turn trigger the symptoms of an allergic reaction; andWHEREAS, Symptoms of a food allergy can include a tingling sensation in the mouth, swelling of the tongue and throat, difficulty breathing, hives, vomiting, a drop in blood pressure, loss of consciousness, or death; andWHEREAS, Consumption of a food allergen may lead to anaphylaxis, a potentially fatal condition in which several different parts of the body experience the allergic reaction and can, within minutes of exposure, lead to difficulty breathing and unconsciousness; and WHEREAS, Zacky Muoz, a California student and food allergy champion 12 years of age, continues to lead the charge in helping to improve the landscape in California schools for children with food allergies; andWHEREAS, There is no cure for a food allergy, only epinephrine intervention, and the only sure way to avoid a reaction is to exercise strict avoidance of an allergen; andWHEREAS, Education, resources, and investing in research that advances treatment and understanding of food allergies are the key to keeping individuals with food allergies safe; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That all Californians be encouraged to make themselves and their families aware of the risk of food allergies and preventative measures, and to educate themselves regarding emergency responses; and be it furtherResolved, That May is Food Allergy Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|