07/02/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2024. | |||
07/02/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4630.) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5710.) | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 20). | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | Introduced. To print. |