02/14/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2023. | |||
02/14/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 165.) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 187.) | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 17). | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 12/17/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 12/16/2022 | Introduced. To print. |