1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 208 CHAPTER 156 Relative to California State Parks Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State July 18, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 208, Papan. California State Parks Week.This measure would proclaim the Legislatures support for California State Parks Week, observed the days of June 12, 2024, to June 16, 2024, inclusive, and provide that the Legislature encourages all Californians and visitors to the state to cherish, protect, enjoy, and find inspiration in the diverse holdings within the state park system.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Californias state parks are a reflection of the states history, natural and cultural heritage, and ideals; andWHEREAS, The California state park system contains the largest and most diverse holdings of any state agency in the nation that can model healthy, natural, and sustainable ecosystems and commemorate important cultural traditions or historic events; andWHEREAS, The Department of Parks and Recreation is entrusted with the preservation, management, and interpretation of the resources within the state park system that includes beaches, historic monuments, lakes and reservoirs, lighthouses, museums, natural and cultural preserves, off-highway vehicle recreation areas, and parks, which include over 340 miles of coastline, 5,200 miles of trails, and 15,000 campsites; andWHEREAS, These natural and historic places are important to improving and protecting the quality of life for all Californians by providing remarkable recreation and learning opportunities, scenic landscapes and open space, and critical and unique habitat that enables the state to meet its climate goals; andWHEREAS, Continued economic success and enjoyment derived from Californias state park system depends on maintaining clean water, healthy ecosystems, and expanding public access for a growing state; andWHEREAS, California State Parks Weeks theme for 2024 is This is Where You Live to encourage Californians to celebrate and recognize the beauty and history of where they live; andWHEREAS, California State Parks Week encourages people to explore new places, nourish their health and well-being, support climate resilience, celebrate community and culture, and care for shared lands; andWHEREAS, California State Parks Week will include the opening of the newest state park in nearly a decade, Dos Rios, which is found in the San Joaquin Valley and will provide both recreational opportunities and protection for critical floodplain habitat; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims its support for California State Parks Week, observed the days of June 12, 2024, to June 16, 2024, inclusive; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages all Californians and visitors to the state to cherish, protect, enjoy, and find inspiration in the diverse holdings within the state park system; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution throughout the state. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled July 10, 2024 Passed IN Senate July 03, 2024 Passed IN Assembly June 13, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 208Introduced by Assembly Member Papan(Principal coauthor: Senator Min)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)June 03, 2024 Relative to California State Parks Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 208, Papan. California State Parks Week.This measure would proclaim the Legislatures support for California State Parks Week, observed the days of June 12, 2024, to June 16, 2024, inclusive, and provide that the Legislature encourages all Californians and visitors to the state to cherish, protect, enjoy, and find inspiration in the diverse holdings within the state park system.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Californias state parks are a reflection of the states history, natural and cultural heritage, and ideals; andWHEREAS, The California state park system contains the largest and most diverse holdings of any state agency in the nation that can model healthy, natural, and sustainable ecosystems and commemorate important cultural traditions or historic events; andWHEREAS, The Department of Parks and Recreation is entrusted with the preservation, management, and interpretation of the resources within the state park system that includes beaches, historic monuments, lakes and reservoirs, lighthouses, museums, natural and cultural preserves, off-highway vehicle recreation areas, and parks, which include over 340 miles of coastline, 5,200 miles of trails, and 15,000 campsites; andWHEREAS, These natural and historic places are important to improving and protecting the quality of life for all Californians by providing remarkable recreation and learning opportunities, scenic landscapes and open space, and critical and unique habitat that enables the state to meet its climate goals; andWHEREAS, Continued economic success and enjoyment derived from Californias state park system depends on maintaining clean water, healthy ecosystems, and expanding public access for a growing state; andWHEREAS, California State Parks Weeks theme for 2024 is This is Where You Live to encourage Californians to celebrate and recognize the beauty and history of where they live; andWHEREAS, California State Parks Week encourages people to explore new places, nourish their health and well-being, support climate resilience, celebrate community and culture, and care for shared lands; andWHEREAS, California State Parks Week will include the opening of the newest state park in nearly a decade, Dos Rios, which is found in the San Joaquin Valley and will provide both recreational opportunities and protection for critical floodplain habitat; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims its support for California State Parks Week, observed the days of June 12, 2024, to June 16, 2024, inclusive; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages all Californians and visitors to the state to cherish, protect, enjoy, and find inspiration in the diverse holdings within the state park system; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution throughout the state. |
---|