|
09/11/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 210, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Adopted and to Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2024
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2024
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|