|
08/26/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2024
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2024
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6200.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Adopted and to Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A., E., S., & T. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
Referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2024
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2024
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|