08/28/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/28/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/22/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 08/19/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2024 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6089.) | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2024 | Introduced. To print. |