Senate | 06/25/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5990.) | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2024 | Introduced. To print. |