08/28/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 194, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/28/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/22/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 5). | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2024 | Introduced. To print. |