1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 223 CHAPTER 195 Relative to California Emergency Preparedness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 28, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 223, Rodriguez. California Emergency Preparedness Month.This measure would proclaim September 2024 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Launched in 2004, National Preparedness Month is the Federal Emergency Management Agencys national annual preparedness outreach; andWHEREAS, National Preparedness Month aims to educate and empower Americans during the month and throughout the year to prepare for and respond to all types of emergencies, including natural disasters and man-made emergencies; and WHEREAS, California has experienced a significant increase over the last decade in emergency situations that require individuals to prepare in advance; and WHEREAS, These disasters include rolling blackouts, wildfires, mudslides, and other occurrences that can leave Californians without power or food for days; andWHEREAS, In the last year, California suffered 14 declared emergencies, including rainstorms, wildfire, and windstorms, and several other emergency situations, such as collapsed infrastructure and heat waves; and WHEREAS, In response to emergencies and disasters, hundreds of thousands of people have been subject to mandatory evacuations; andWHEREAS, It is more critical than ever before that Californians have a plan prior to experiencing these events; andWHEREAS, These plans should include access to adequate shelter, reserves of food and water, backup power for communication devices, plans for pets, and access to transportation; and WHEREAS, September is celebrated as National Preparedness Month; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2024 as California Emergency Preparedness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians to acknowledge the importance of planning for emergencies to protect themselves and their families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled August 26, 2024 Passed IN Senate August 22, 2024 Passed IN Assembly August 08, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 223Introduced by Assembly Member Rodriguez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)July 03, 2024 Relative to California Emergency Preparedness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 223, Rodriguez. California Emergency Preparedness Month.This measure would proclaim September 2024 as California Emergency Preparedness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Launched in 2004, National Preparedness Month is the Federal Emergency Management Agencys national annual preparedness outreach; andWHEREAS, National Preparedness Month aims to educate and empower Americans during the month and throughout the year to prepare for and respond to all types of emergencies, including natural disasters and man-made emergencies; and WHEREAS, California has experienced a significant increase over the last decade in emergency situations that require individuals to prepare in advance; and WHEREAS, These disasters include rolling blackouts, wildfires, mudslides, and other occurrences that can leave Californians without power or food for days; andWHEREAS, In the last year, California suffered 14 declared emergencies, including rainstorms, wildfire, and windstorms, and several other emergency situations, such as collapsed infrastructure and heat waves; and WHEREAS, In response to emergencies and disasters, hundreds of thousands of people have been subject to mandatory evacuations; andWHEREAS, It is more critical than ever before that Californians have a plan prior to experiencing these events; andWHEREAS, These plans should include access to adequate shelter, reserves of food and water, backup power for communication devices, plans for pets, and access to transportation; and WHEREAS, September is celebrated as National Preparedness Month; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2024 as California Emergency Preparedness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians to acknowledge the importance of planning for emergencies to protect themselves and their families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|