05/03/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2023. | |||
05/03/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 815.) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 890.) | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 16). | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | Introduced. To print. |