1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 29 CHAPTER 77 Relative to Student Mental Health Awareness Week in California. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 02, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 29, Quirk-Silva. Student Mental Health Awareness Week in California.This measure would recognize May 8, 2023, to May 12, 2023, inclusive, as Student Mental Health Awareness Week in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Mental health is an important part of a childs overall health and well-being. Mental health includes childrens mental, emotional, and behavioral well-being, and mental health affects how children think, feel, and act; andWHEREAS, Mental health issues among children can seriously change how children learn, behave, or handle their emotions, causing distress and problems in getting through the day; and WHEREAS, Additionally, the use of social media by students can result in social anxiety or depression and may result in a tendency to spend more time online and reduce students real face-to-face interactions with other people; andWHEREAS, More than 42 percent of high school students experienced persistent feelings of sadness or hopelessness in 2021, a 50-percent increase since 2011; andWHEREAS, In 2021, research shows 51 percent of students were reported to be overwhelmed by virtual learning and 31 percent of students experienced the loss of a loved one; andWHEREAS, Currently, roughly one-fifth of students, or 22 percent, felt they might be traumatized and would not be the same because of the pandemic, and 45 percent of students reported feeling depressed; andWHEREAS, The early identification and treatment of mental health and behavioral issues are critical components for a healthy student body and school community; andWHEREAS, The role of school counselors, social workers, and psychologists in serving children and youth in schools has an opportunity to address student mental and behavioral health early and effectively; andWHEREAS, Students often struggle with mental health and behavioral issues, and school counselors help to identify the warning signs from students; andWHEREAS, School counselors also offer a range of services to help reduce mental health stigma; andWHEREAS, Students are provided with services and programs by school counselors that aim to improve students feelings of connectedness within the school environment; andWHEREAS, Support for all students regarding trauma caused by racial injustice is often addressed by school counselors who are also in a position to promote equity and healing; andWHEREAS, The need for comprehensive and coordinated mental and behavioral health services for students in school is a critical part of an overall education plan; andWHEREAS, It is important to set aside a week that recognizes the mental health of students in order to support the needs and well-being of students in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes May 8, 2023, to May 12, 2023, inclusive, as Student Mental Health Awareness Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 30, 2023 Passed IN Senate May 26, 2023 Passed IN Assembly May 08, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 29Introduced by Assembly Member Quirk-Silva(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)March 02, 2023 Relative to Student Mental Health Awareness Week in California. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 29, Quirk-Silva. Student Mental Health Awareness Week in California.This measure would recognize May 8, 2023, to May 12, 2023, inclusive, as Student Mental Health Awareness Week in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Mental health is an important part of a childs overall health and well-being. Mental health includes childrens mental, emotional, and behavioral well-being, and mental health affects how children think, feel, and act; andWHEREAS, Mental health issues among children can seriously change how children learn, behave, or handle their emotions, causing distress and problems in getting through the day; and WHEREAS, Additionally, the use of social media by students can result in social anxiety or depression and may result in a tendency to spend more time online and reduce students real face-to-face interactions with other people; andWHEREAS, More than 42 percent of high school students experienced persistent feelings of sadness or hopelessness in 2021, a 50-percent increase since 2011; andWHEREAS, In 2021, research shows 51 percent of students were reported to be overwhelmed by virtual learning and 31 percent of students experienced the loss of a loved one; andWHEREAS, Currently, roughly one-fifth of students, or 22 percent, felt they might be traumatized and would not be the same because of the pandemic, and 45 percent of students reported feeling depressed; andWHEREAS, The early identification and treatment of mental health and behavioral issues are critical components for a healthy student body and school community; andWHEREAS, The role of school counselors, social workers, and psychologists in serving children and youth in schools has an opportunity to address student mental and behavioral health early and effectively; andWHEREAS, Students often struggle with mental health and behavioral issues, and school counselors help to identify the warning signs from students; andWHEREAS, School counselors also offer a range of services to help reduce mental health stigma; andWHEREAS, Students are provided with services and programs by school counselors that aim to improve students feelings of connectedness within the school environment; andWHEREAS, Support for all students regarding trauma caused by racial injustice is often addressed by school counselors who are also in a position to promote equity and healing; andWHEREAS, The need for comprehensive and coordinated mental and behavioral health services for students in school is a critical part of an overall education plan; andWHEREAS, It is important to set aside a week that recognizes the mental health of students in order to support the needs and well-being of students in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes May 8, 2023, to May 12, 2023, inclusive, as Student Mental Health Awareness Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|