04/25/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2023. | |||
04/25/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 701.) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 692.) | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 9). | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | Introduced. To print. |