Assembly | 09/14/2023 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Alvarez. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17). | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | Introduced. To print. |