05/03/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2023. | |||
05/03/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 813.) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 235.) | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 26). | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | Introduced. To print. |