05/11/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2023. | |||
05/11/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1005.) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1168.) | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | Introduced measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | Introduced. To print. |